NJ S2801 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases statute of limitations for prosecution of theft of firearm. *
Title
Increases statute of limitations for prosecution of theft of firearm. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4167 (Same As) 2013-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee