NJ S2808 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-22 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-22 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Madison Holleran Suicide Prevention Act"; requires institutions of higher education to have individuals who focus on reducing student suicides and attempted suicides available 24 hours a day.*
Title
"Madison Holleran Suicide Prevention Act"; requires institutions of higher education to have individuals who focus on reducing student suicides and attempted suicides available 24 hours a day.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2808 (Carry Over) 2015-06-22 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4293 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4293 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee