NJ S2809 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A2181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A2181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits NJTA from requiring county guarantee to provide maintenance of pedestrian bridge under certain circumstances when determining approval for construction of pedestrian bridge.
Title
Prohibits NJTA from requiring county guarantee to provide maintenance of pedestrian bridge under certain circumstances when determining approval for construction of pedestrian bridge.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Substituted by A2181 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2181 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.109.