NJ S2817 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows active duty service members to provide document other than DD-214 when claiming veterans' preference for civil service.
Title
Allows active duty service members to provide document other than DD-214 when claiming veterans' preference for civil service.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4624 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4624 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.340. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-1) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4624 |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4624 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S2817