NJ S2828 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S782
Note: Carry Over of previous A3932
Note: Carry Over of previous A3932
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes program to subsidize purchase price of medical cannabis for registered qualifying patients enrolled in Medicaid or NJ FamilyCare programs.
Title
Establishes program to subsidize purchase price of medical cannabis for registered qualifying patients enrolled in Medicaid or NJ FamilyCare programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S782 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3932 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A898 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3932 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A898 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2828 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2828_I1.HTM |