NJ S2834 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.133.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.133.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
The "Water Quality Accountability Act"; imposes certain testing, reporting, management, and infrastructure investment requirements on water purveyors.
Title
The "Water Quality Accountability Act"; imposes certain testing, reporting, management, and infrastructure investment requirements on water purveyors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4569 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.133. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A4569 (1R) |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4569 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - Substituted by S2834 (1R)