NJ S2848 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.151.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.151.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school bus drivers to submit medical certificate to employer to prove continuing physical fitness and to submit to medical examination that includes certain screenings.*
Title
Requires school bus drivers to submit medical certificate to employer to prove continuing physical fitness and to submit to medical examination that includes certain screenings.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4346 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.151. |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4346 (2R) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Lagana) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4346 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2848 (3R)