NJ S2854 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5301
Note: Carry Over of previous S3691
Note: Carry Over of previous S3691
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A1625 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A1625 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DOE to develop outreach program to encourage young women and minorities to pursue post-secondary degrees and careers in STEM.
Title
Directs DOE to develop outreach program to encourage young women and minorities to pursue post-secondary degrees and careers in STEM.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted by A1625 (1R) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1625 (Same As) 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.239.
A5301 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3691 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5301 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3691 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee