NJ S2868 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides supplemental appropriation of $4.141 million from Property Tax Relief Fund to DOE for aid to school districts with significant enrollment growth.**
Title
Provides supplemental appropriation of $4.141 million from Property Tax Relief Fund to DOE for aid to school districts with significant enrollment growth.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-10 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee | |
2011-09-26 | Passed by the Senate (32-7) | |
2011-08-25 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-23 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-06-23 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3961 (Same As) 2011-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee