NJ S2870 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4531
Note: Carry Over of previous S3521
Note: Carry Over of previous S3521
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance coverage of standard fertility preservation services for individuals with certain menstrual disorders resulting in infertility.
Title
Requires health insurance coverage of standard fertility preservation services for individuals with certain menstrual disorders resulting in infertility.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2002 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A4531 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3521 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4531 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3521 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2870 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2870_I1.HTM |