NJ S289 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S994
Note: Carry Over of previous S3778
Note: Carry Over of previous A5646
Note: Carry Over of previous S3778
Note: Carry Over of previous A5646
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Small Business Indoor Air Quality Management Support Program."
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Small Business Indoor Air Quality Management Support Program."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S289 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3778 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5646 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A1798 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3778 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5646 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A1798 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee