NJ S2905 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2044
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.285.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.285.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain possession, sale, trade, distribution, or offering for sale of shark fins.
Title
Prohibits certain possession, sale, trade, distribution, or offering for sale of shark fins.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4845 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.285. |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-19-1) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4845 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-6) |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2044 (Carry Over) 2017-01-19 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4845 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S2905 (1R)
A4845 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S2905 (1R)