NJ S2918 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Substituted by A4339 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Substituted by A4339 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Mom2Mom Peer Support Program" telephone helpline.
Title
Establishes "Mom2Mom Peer Support Program" telephone helpline.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | Substituted by A4339 (1R) |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-07-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4339 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.281.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2918 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2918_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2918_R1.HTM |