NJ S2981 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A883
Note: Carry Over of previous S2441
Note: Carry Over of previous S2441
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Military Family Relief Fund; provides for designation on State gross income tax return to permit taxpayers to make voluntary contributions to military family relief fund.
Title
Establishes NJ Military Family Relief Fund; provides for designation on State gross income tax return to permit taxpayers to make voluntary contributions to military family relief fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2712 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A883 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2441 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A883 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2441 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2981 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2981_I1.HTM |