NJ S2995 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.103.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.103.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for establishment of central municipal courts.
Title
Revises requirements for establishment of central municipal courts.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3959 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3959 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3959 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.103. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A3959 (1R) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-2) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3959 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S2995