NJ S300 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A808
Note: Carry Foward to future S221
Note: Carry Over of previous S4140
Note: Carry Foward to future S221
Note: Carry Over of previous S4140
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Division of Purchase and Property to issue annual report on public contracts awarded to women-owned and minority-owned businesses; requires Division of Revenue to operate Selective Assistance Vendor Information (SAVI) database.
Title
Requires Division of Purchase and Property to issue annual report on public contracts awarded to women-owned and minority-owned businesses; requires Division of Revenue to operate Selective Assistance Vendor Information (SAVI) database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S300 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S300 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S4140 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2792 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S300 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S4140 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2792 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S300 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/300_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S300 |