NJ S3031 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2310
Note: Carry Foward to future S2020
Note: Carry Over of previous A4645
Note: Carry Over of previous S3111
Note: Carry Foward to future S2020
Note: Carry Over of previous A4645
Note: Carry Over of previous S3111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance carriers to categorize mental health treatment and therapy received by victim of domestic violence as medically necessary treatment and provide full benefits coverage therefor.
Title
Requires health insurance carriers to categorize mental health treatment and therapy received by victim of domestic violence as medically necessary treatment and provide full benefits coverage therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3031 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3031 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1924 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A4645 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3111 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3031 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1924 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A4645 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3111 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S3031 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3500/3031_I1.HTM |