NJ S3072 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs New Jersey Economic Development Authority and Commission on Higher Education to promote the establishment of higher education and business partnerships.
Title
Directs New Jersey Economic Development Authority and Commission on Higher Education to promote the establishment of higher education and business partnerships.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Buono [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee | |
2011-12-15 | Passed by the Senate (35-2) | |
2011-11-10 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-09-22 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2398 (Same As) 2011-03-03 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (22-16) (Madden)