NJ S3072 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Sign Fabrication Safety Quality Assurance Act."
Title
"Sign Fabrication Safety Quality Assurance Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. William Spearman [D] |
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5018 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5018 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.84. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-1) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A5018 (2R) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-1) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5018 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3072 (2R)