NJ S3103 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2277
Note: Carry Foward to future A4718
Note: Carry Foward to future S3302
Note: Carry Foward to future A4718
Note: Carry Foward to future S3302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes FY 2015 supplemental appropriation to DOH for $7,453,000 for family planning services.
Title
Makes FY 2015 supplemental appropriation to DOH for $7,453,000 for family planning services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A3672 |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3103 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3672
S3103 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3672
S3103 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3672
A3672 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S3103 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3672
S3103 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3672
A3672 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly