NJ S3112 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A281
Note: Carry Over of previous S2501
Note: Carry Over of previous S2501
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Substituted by A2493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Substituted by A2493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines indigent veteran and veteran status for certain veteran interment purposes.
Title
Defines indigent veteran and veteran status for certain veteran interment purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Sen. Edward Durr [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | Senate | Substituted by A2493 |
2022-10-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2493 (Same As) 2023-03-10 - Approved P.L.2023, c.17.
A281 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2501 (Carry Over) 2020-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A281 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2501 (Carry Over) 2020-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee