NJ S3124 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.316.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.316.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires landlords to allow tenants to pay rent up to three business days after eviction order or lockout is executed and accept rent payments by any means.
Title
Requires landlords to allow tenants to pay rent up to three business days after eviction order or lockout is executed and accept rent payments by any means.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5493 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.316. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-6-2) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A5493 (1R) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5493 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3124 (1R)