NJ S3128 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4525 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4525 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands opportunities for restaurants, bars, distilleries and breweries to provide outdoor dining and permits certain farms to adjust operations in response to COVID-19 public health emergency.
Title
Expands opportunities for restaurants, bars, distilleries and breweries to provide outdoor dining and permits certain farms to adjust operations in response to COVID-19 public health emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Senate | Substituted by A4525 (2R) |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4525 (Same As) 2021-01-04 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly