NJ S3128 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A4694 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A4694 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns tax treatment of individual's income earned outside state of residence; appropriates $35 million.
Title
Concerns tax treatment of individual's income earned outside state of residence; appropriates $35 million.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A4694 (3R) |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4694 (Same As) 2023-07-21 - Approved P.L.2023, c.125.