NJ S3182 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.252.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.252.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delays certain documentation submission deadlines under certain business tax credit programs.*
Title
Delays certain documentation submission deadlines under certain business tax credit programs.*
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] |
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4690 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.252. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-7-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4690 (2R) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Ruiz) |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4690 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3182 (2R)