NJ S3196 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A5116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A5116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes State Treasurer to sell and convey certain surplus real property located in Township of Mahwah, County of Bergen.
Title
Authorizes State Treasurer to sell and convey certain surplus real property located in Township of Mahwah, County of Bergen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Senate | Substituted by A5116 |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5116 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.14.