NJ S3215 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.319.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.319.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to use 20-year time horizon and most recent Intergovernmental Panel on Climate Change Assessment Report when calculating global warming potential to measure global warming impact of greenhouse gases.
Title
Requires State to use 20-year time horizon and most recent Intergovernmental Panel on Climate Change Assessment Report when calculating global warming potential to measure global warming impact of greenhouse gases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4606 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.319. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-8-2) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4606 (1R) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-2) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4606 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3215 (1R)