NJ S3233 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S85
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4863
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4863
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires warning sign to be posted at pontoon boat rental businesses; designated as "Christopher's Law."
Title
Requires warning sign to be posted at pontoon boat rental businesses; designated as "Christopher's Law."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A4863 |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3233 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4863
A4863 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.307.
A4863 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.307.