NJ S3233 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4716
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies performance and maintenance guarantee requirements under "Municipal Land Use Law."
Title
Modifies performance and maintenance guarantee requirements under "Municipal Land Use Law."
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. John Wisniewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1425 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1425 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A1425 (3R) |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1425 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3233 (3R)
A4716 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4716 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee