NJ S3253 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S293
Note: Carry Over of previous A5383
Note: Carry Over of previous A5383
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.279.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.279.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes alternate route to expedite certification of teachers at early college high school programs.
Title
Establishes alternate route to expedite certification of teachers at early college high school programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2619 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2619 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.279. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A2619 (1R) |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3253 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.279.
A2619 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3253 (1R)
A5383 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2619 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3253 (1R)
A5383 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee