NJ S3258 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-12 - Substituted by A4710 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-12 - Substituted by A4710 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Strengthening Gifted and Talented Education Act"; establishes school district responsibilities in educating gifted and talented students.
Title
"Strengthening Gifted and Talented Education Act"; establishes school district responsibilities in educating gifted and talented students.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Senate | Substituted by A4710 (1R) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Beach) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4710 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.338.