NJ S3262 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4416 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4416 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale or distribution of products containing asbestos.
Title
Prohibits sale or distribution of products containing asbestos.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted by A4416 (1R) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4416 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.114.