NJ S3262 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by A4756 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Substituted by A4756 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Division of Children's System of Care to establish training program for employees of emergency shelters for homeless.
Title
Requires Division of Children's System of Care to establish training program for employees of emergency shelters for homeless.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4756 (ACS) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4756 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.53.