NJ S3265 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A966
Note: Carry Over of previous A3704
Note: Carry Over of previous A3704
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.425.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.425.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale or distribution of flavored vapor products.*
Title
Prohibits sale or distribution of flavored vapor products.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3178 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.425. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-11-10) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A3178 (2R) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3265 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.425.
A3178 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3265 (1R)
A3704 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3178 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3265 (1R)
A3704 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee