NJ S3275 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Approved P.L.2024, c.33.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Approved P.L.2024, c.33.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revises various provisions of film and digital media content production tax credit program.
Title
Revises various provisions of film and digital media content production tax credit program.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4448 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4448 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2024, c.33. |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-3-0) |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Substituted for A4448 (1R) |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-4) |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4448 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Substituted by S3275 (2R)