NJ S3308 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-20 - Approved P.L.2017, c.245.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-20 - Approved P.L.2017, c.245.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decreases waiting period to expunge entire juvenile record from five to three years.
Title
Decreases waiting period to expunge entire juvenile record from five to three years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5037 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.245. |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-0-0) |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Substituted for A5037 |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5037 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S3308