NJ S332 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2584
Note: Carry Foward to future S1389
Note: Carry Over of previous S1257
Note: Carry Over of previous A5448
Note: Carry Over of previous S2294
Note: Carry Over of previous A3590
Note: Carry Foward to future S1389
Note: Carry Over of previous S1257
Note: Carry Over of previous A5448
Note: Carry Over of previous S2294
Note: Carry Over of previous A3590
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.266.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.266.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notification to consumers of collection and disclosure of personal data by certain entities.
Title
Requires notification to consumers of collection and disclosure of personal data by certain entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1971 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1971 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.266. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-14) |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (46-27-0) |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A1971 (3R) |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-11) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2022-11-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Sarlo) |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S332 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.266.
S332 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.266.
S1257 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5448 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A1971 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S332 (6R)
S2294 (Carry Over) 2020-03-19 - Substituted by A3850
A3590 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S332 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.266.
S1257 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5448 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A1971 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S332 (6R)
S2294 (Carry Over) 2020-03-19 - Substituted by A3850
A3590 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee