NJ S3366 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4244
Note: Carry Over of previous A4244
Note: Carry Over of previous A4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot reentry court program.
Title
Establishes pilot reentry court program.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A321 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4244 (Carry Over) 2015-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4244 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2562
A4244 (Carry Over) 2015-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4244 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2562
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S3366 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S3500/3366_I1.HTM |