NJ S3438 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5341 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5341 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates 2-1-1 telephone system information to include all current modes of public transit and information on access and usage.
Title
Updates 2-1-1 telephone system information to include all current modes of public transit and information on access and usage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5341 (1R) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5341 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.361.