NJ S3441 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4970 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4970 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law governing forfeiture of certain seized property.*
Title
Revises law governing forfeiture of certain seized property.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4970 (3R) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4970 (Same As) 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.371.