NJ S3484 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5434 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5434 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases amount of solar energy generation on lands eligible for farmland assessment under certain conditions; revises law concerning solar energy generation on preserved farmland; directs BPU to provide certain incentives to "dual-use" solar projects on unpreserved farmland.
Title
Increases amount of solar energy generation on lands eligible for farmland assessment under certain conditions; revises law concerning solar energy generation on preserved farmland; directs BPU to provide certain incentives to "dual-use" solar projects on unpreserved farmland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5434 (ACS) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5434 (Same As) 2021-07-09 - Approved P.L.2021, c.170.