NJ S3508 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A4284 (5R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A4284 (5R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits seller from imposing certain surcharge for credit card transactions; establishes certain notice requirements regarding surcharge.
Title
Prohibits seller from imposing certain surcharge for credit card transactions; establishes certain notice requirements regarding surcharge.
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A4284 (5R) |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4284 (Same As) 2023-08-18 - Approved P.L.2023, c.146.