NJ S3509 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases dedication of certain revenues to "New Jersey Wine Promotion Account."
Title
Increases dedication of certain revenues to "New Jersey Wine Promotion Account."
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4732 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4732 |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4732 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3509