NJ S3521 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows expanded use of recycled asphalt pavement.
Title
Allows expanded use of recycled asphalt pavement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A5194 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A5194 (1R) |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment (28-0) (Gordon) |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5194 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3521 (1R)