NJ S3605 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for uniform testing and reporting of drug overdose deaths and consolidated service purchasing by medical examiners, and expands list of places where State Medical Examiner may be authorized to use lab facilities.
Title
Provides for uniform testing and reporting of drug overdose deaths and consolidated service purchasing by medical examiners, and expands list of places where State Medical Examiner may be authorized to use lab facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5299 (Same As) 2017-12-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee