NJ S364 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S490
Note: Carry Over of previous S4082
Note: Carry Over of previous A6086
Note: Carry Over of previous S4082
Note: Carry Over of previous A6086
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that leaving scene of motor vehicle accident is crime of first degree if accident results in death of another person.
Title
Provides that leaving scene of motor vehicle accident is crime of first degree if accident results in death of another person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S364 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4082 (Carry Over) 2019-08-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A6086 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S4082 (Carry Over) 2019-08-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A6086 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S364 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/364_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S364 |