NJ S367 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2975
Note: Carry Foward to future S542
Note: Carry Over of previous S1948
Note: Carry Over of previous A2463
Note: Carry Foward to future S542
Note: Carry Over of previous S1948
Note: Carry Over of previous A2463
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades crime of stalking when stalking activity is carried out or assisted by installation or use of communication or location monitoring program or device on cellular phone or wireless mobile device.
Title
Upgrades crime of stalking when stalking activity is carried out or assisted by installation or use of communication or location monitoring program or device on cellular phone or wireless mobile device.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S367 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S367 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1948 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2463 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A2874 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S367 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1948 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2463 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A2874 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S367 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/367_I1.HTM |