NJ S3809 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A681
Note: Carry Foward to future S1252
Note: Carry Foward to future S588
Note: Carry Foward to future S1252
Note: Carry Foward to future S588
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows credit against corporation business tax and gross income tax liability for employing persons with a developmental disability.
Title
Allows credit against corporation business tax and gross income tax liability for employing persons with a developmental disability.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3809 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
S3809 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
S3809 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
A5986 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S3809 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
S3809 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
A5986 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee