NJ S381 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2414
Note: Carry Foward to future S3457
Note: Carry Over of previous S314
Note: Carry Over of previous A1043
Note: Carry Over of previous S238
Note: Carry Foward to future S3457
Note: Carry Over of previous S314
Note: Carry Over of previous A1043
Note: Carry Over of previous S238
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Out-of-School Time Advisory Commission" to review before-school, after-school, and summer programs.
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Out-of-School Time Advisory Commission" to review before-school, after-school, and summer programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S381 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S381 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S314 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1043 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1163 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S238 (Carry Over) 2020-11-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.126.
S381 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S314 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1043 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1163 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S238 (Carry Over) 2020-11-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.126.