NJ S401 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S840
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A2394 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A2394 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies in this State to establish minority recruitment and selection programs; establishes reporting requirement.
Title
Requires law enforcement agencies in this State to establish minority recruitment and selection programs; establishes reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted by A2394 (1R) |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S840 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2394 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.107.
A2394 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.107.